U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Smith v. New Neighborhoods, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.