U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Fener et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 13, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • October 01, 2024: [Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.