U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00356
  • Case Name: Hernandez-Colon v. Claver-Obinna et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 11, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 02, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 02, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.