U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01012
  • Case Name: Champs CT LLC v. Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.