U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00805
  • Case Name: Rankin v. Connecticut Municipal Electric Energy Cooperative
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.