U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Shafik v. Aston Martin Lagonda of North America Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reopen Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • October 06, 2024: [Response]
  • October 02, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.