U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Owens v. City of Stamford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 07, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 07, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: [Exhibit]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 02, 2024: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.