U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01295
  • Case Name: Andre v. Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Response]
  • March 19, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.