U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01080
  • Case Name: Pizziconi v. Gray et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Update Answer Deadline]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.