U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01677
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Beausoleil et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Clerk's Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.