U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01584
  • Case Name: Britt v. Chief Public Defender Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disqualify Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.