U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01583
  • Case Name: Bibiloni v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order re: Insufficiency]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Prisoner E-Filing Order (Intake)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.