U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ogman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Jury Selection]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 04, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Memo]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preclude]
  • March 17, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Produce ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclosure ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Frye Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.