U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01505
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Muhammad et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objection]
  • May 09, 2025: [Take Deposition]
  • May 09, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 14, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 01, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sanctions]
  • October 11, 2024: [Objection]
  • October 07, 2024: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.