U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00823
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Fox et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Writ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.