U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01014
  • Case Name: Jusino v. Wolf-Craig
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 09, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Contempt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.