U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01586
  • Case Name: Costa v. Kocaqi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service - Prisoner]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order re: Prisoner Case Discovery (Intake)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Prisoner E-Filing Order (Intake)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 03, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.