U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Vicente v. Wiggins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.