U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00226
  • Case Name: M&T Capital and Leasing Corp. v. K2 Leasing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Statement of Material Facts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.