U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00596
  • Case Name: Tino v. Walmart Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 03, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.