U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01474
  • Case Name: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Bakx et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Quash]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 19, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.