U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00773
  • Case Name: Foster v. State of Connecticut
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.