U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01436
  • Case Name: Liu v. Sweet Basil Fairfield LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.