U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01133
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Connecticut Coalition Against Domestic Violence et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Referring Case to PJO]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 06, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.