U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01404
  • Case Name: Burke v. Bristol Board of Education
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 28, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 07, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.