U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01294
  • Case Name: Miceli v. Wearable Health Solutions, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 11, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Trial Memo]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.