U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00694
  • Case Name: Robinson et al v. Chisholm et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.