U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01604
  • Case Name: Fautner v. Quinous et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Copy]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Copy]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Copy]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Returning Submission]
  • March 18, 2025: [Copy]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2025: [Clarification]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Prisoner E-Filing Order (Intake)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 08, 2024: [Prisoner Authorization Form]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.