U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01073
  • Case Name: Krayer v. Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.