U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00286
  • Case Name: Owens v. City of Milford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 07, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Compel]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.