U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01502
  • Case Name: Poirier v. Arvest Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • May 01, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.