U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01483
  • Case Name: Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T. District Council #11 Health Fund et al v. J & G Glass Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.