U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00931
  • Case Name: Abira Medical Laboratories, LLC v. Aetna, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.