U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01612
  • Case Name: Cornish v. Guardian Asset Management
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response]
  • May 08, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • March 29, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • March 28, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 20, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reconsideration]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: [Objection]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Objection]
  • October 09, 2024: [Response]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.