U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00832
  • Case Name: Rosenzweig Center for Rapid Recovery, LLC et al v. Ebaugh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.