U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01458
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Quiros et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • April 01, 2025: [Substitute Party]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.