U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01619
  • Case Name: Curry v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 26, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2025: [Compel]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.