U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00446
  • Case Name: EquiGroomer, LLC v. SleekEZ, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 03, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 10, 2024: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.