U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01423
  • Case Name: Steins v. Sunrun, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Request to Issue Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.