U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00791
  • Case Name: Hunt v. Tilcon Connecticut, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Pre-Filing Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.