U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01393
  • Case Name: Nizeul v. ICF Technology, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.