U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00967
  • Case Name: Burgess v. Barone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Compel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.