U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01639
  • Case Name: Leslie v. Trans Union, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Proposed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.