U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01672
  • Case Name: Sanseverino v. Conaway et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 11, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.