U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voloshin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Restitution Order]
November, 2024
  • November 03, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.