U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Norwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Commissioner]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.