U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01713
  • Case Name: Tomlin et al v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.