U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01736
  • Case Name: Donaldson v. Eurofins Scientific, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.