U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01495
  • Case Name: Inman v. Kullgren et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.