U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Dawson v. State of Connecticut Department of Correction
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 21, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.